MO HB1064 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Removes references to the phrases "mentally retarded" and "mental retardation" from statute and replaces them with "intellectually disabled" and "intellectual disability", respectively
Title
Removes references to the phrases "mentally retarded" and "mental retardation" from statute and replaces them with "intellectually disabled" and "intellectual disability", respectively
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Voted Do Pass Consent (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 8, 2014, 8:00am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Pensions(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 PRESENT: 1 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Children, Families, and Persons with Disabilities(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |