MO HB111 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding sales tax on used manufactured homes
Title
Changes the laws regarding sales tax on used manufactured homes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-05 - House - HB 111 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 132 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-22 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 9, 2015, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 132 NOES: 17 PRESENT: 1 |
2015-03-05 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2015-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-03 | House | Prefiled (H) |