MO HB1136 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding elections
Title
Changes the laws regarding elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-08 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-08 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-08 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 139 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-08 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-01 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 141 NOES: 5 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2014-03-11 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | Re-committed to Committee: Rules(H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Elections(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-06 | House | Prefiled (H) |