MO HB1193 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 3 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 3 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SS PENDING
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act and changes the laws regarding the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances
Title
Establishes the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program Act and changes the laws regarding the prescribing and dispensing of controlled substances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 3 TO SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SSA 1 FOR SA 1, SS PENDING | |
2012-05-03 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-05 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, MARCH 26, 2012, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-22 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 143 NOES: 6 | |
2012-03-06 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-06 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Laid Over (H) | |
2012-02-27 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-15 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-09 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-09 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-12 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-01-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |