MO HB1277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Referred: Judiciary(H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Abolishes the death penalty and specifies that any person sentenced to death before August 28, 2020, must be sentenced to life imprisonment without parole.
Title
Abolishes the death penalty and specifies that any person sentenced to death before August 28, 2020, must be sentenced to life imprisonment without parole.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1277&year=2020&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills201/hlrbillspdf/3216H.01I.pdf |