MO HB1302 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-20 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from regulating the manufacture, performance, or use of residential wood burning appliances unless authorized to do so by the General Assembly
Title
Prohibits the Department of Natural Resources from regulating the manufacture, performance, or use of residential wood burning appliances unless authorized to do so by the General Assembly
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-20 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate Recedes from Position (S) - SS SCS |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up |
2014-05-16 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2014-05-16 | House | House Requests Senate to Recede (H) - Take up and pass HCS HB 1302 |
2014-05-16 | House | House Refuses to Adopt (C) |
2014-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 1 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-05-06 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 15, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-01 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 21 |
2014-04-01 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2014-03-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-03-05 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2014-01-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |