MO HB1319 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-30 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary And Civil And Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding weapons
Title
Changes the laws regarding weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 30, UPON EVENING ADJOURNMENT SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-29 | Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S) | |
2012-03-19 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-08 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4 ADOPTED | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-23 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-21 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |