MO HB1328 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Small Business (H)
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Small Business (H)
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any employee of a seller of cigarettes or tobacco products who is younger than 18 years of age from selling cigarettes or tobacco products in the course of his or her employment
Title
Prohibits any employee of a seller of cigarettes or tobacco products who is younger than 18 years of age from selling cigarettes or tobacco products in the course of his or her employment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-07 | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1328&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1328I.htm |