MO HB1355 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health carriers to reimburse a physical therapist in the same amounts as paid to a licensed physical therapist for rendering the same services regardless of the setting or venue
Title
Requires health carriers to reimburse a physical therapist in the same amounts as paid to a licensed physical therapist for rendering the same services regardless of the setting or venue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1355&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1355I.htm |