MO HB1355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster
Title
Allows retired police officers to return to work when a disaster or emergency has been proclaimed by the governor or there is a national disaster
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 133 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2018-05-16 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs w/SENATE AMENDMENTS - INF (Y: 138 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House: HB 1355 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2018-06-01 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2018-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2018-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2018-05-30 | House | Constitutional Objection Filed (H) |
2018-05-16 | House | House Message (H) |
2018-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 138 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS as amended AYES: 133 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 1 |
2018-05-16 | House | Taken Up |
2018-05-16 | House | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS as amended |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - sa 1, sa 2, sa 3, sa 4, sa 5, sa 6 AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 3, 2018, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Senate Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6 adopted |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Taken Up |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-04-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 15, 2018, 8:15am, Senate Lounge |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety(S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2018-02-21 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-02-21 | House | Taken Up |
2018-02-07 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-30 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-30 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H) |
2018-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2018-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2018-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |