MO HB1358 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding infrastructure replacement surcharges for water and sewer corporations
Title
Changes the laws regarding infrastructure replacement surcharges for water and sewer corporations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment(S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-04-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 86 NOES: 59 |
2014-04-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-04-23 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2014-04-22 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-25 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Public Hearing Continued (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2014-01-22 | House | Referred: Utilities(H) |
2014-01-15 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |