MO HB1392 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-08 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding property tax rates
Title
Changes the laws regarding property tax rates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-08 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-08 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 144 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1 | |
2010-04-28 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SCS | |
2010-04-28 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-07 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 7, 2010, 12:00P.M.,SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2010-03-30 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-03-29 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-24 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-02-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2009-12-17 | Prefiled (H) |