MO HB1397 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Title
Changes the laws regarding political subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-28 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-28 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |