MO HB1400 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the investment of certain public funds, perfection of security interests, Division of Finance examinations, and residential mortgage loan brokers
Title
Changes the laws regarding the investment of certain public funds, perfection of security interests, Division of Finance examinations, and residential mortgage loan brokers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-10 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-16 | Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 118 NOES: 30 | |
2012-05-16 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 1 | |
2012-05-16 | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 149 NOES: 1 | |
2012-05-03 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS | |
2012-05-02 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 31 NAYES: 01 | |
2012-05-02 | Third Read and Passed (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 02 | |
2012-05-02 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2012-04-26 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 2, 2:30 PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-03-29 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-22 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 0 | |
2012-03-21 | Perfected (H) | |
2012-03-21 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-02-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-02-20 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: Financial Institutions (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |