MO HB1424 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the State Highway Patrol to sell surplus watercraft, watercraft motors, and trailers as well as vehicles
Title
Authorizes the State Highway Patrol to sell surplus watercraft, watercraft motors, and trailers as well as vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-06 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2012-07-06 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2012-05-18 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-18 | Senate Recedes from Position (S) - ON SA 1 | |
2012-05-17 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2012-05-17 | Reported to the House with... (S) - AS AMENDED | |
2012-05-17 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED YEAS: 30 NAYS: 00 | |
2012-05-17 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2012-05-16 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 1:30PM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-05 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-03-28 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 1 | |
2012-03-27 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-23 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |