MO HB1435 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies current provisions regarding sales tax refund claims
Title
Modifies current provisions regarding sales tax refund claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1435 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1435 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: HB 1435 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-05-13 - House - House: HB 1435 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: HB 1435 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-28 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-28 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 140 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 143 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2016-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-05-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-05-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-12 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, March 10, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2016-02-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |