MO HB1441 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-12 - Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Division of Drug and Crime Control, in conjunction with the Crime Laboratory Division, to create a pilot program that uses technologies and protocols to instantly identify new synthetic drugs
Title
Requires the Division of Drug and Crime Control, in conjunction with the Crime Laboratory Division, to create a pilot program that uses technologies and protocols to instantly identify new synthetic drugs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1441&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1441I.PDF |