MO HB1445 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Children And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the funding mechanism for the tax credit for residential renovations for disability access and extends its expiration from December 31, 2013, to December 31, 2016
Title
Changes the funding mechanism for the tax credit for residential renovations for disability access and extends its expiration from December 31, 2013, to December 31, 2016
Sponsors
Rep. Clem Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-01-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-01-19 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1445&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1445I.htm |