MO HB1448 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding judicial procedures
Title
Changes the laws regarding judicial procedures
Sponsors
Rep. Stanley Cox [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-24 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |