MO HB1455 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the burden of proof for the Director of the Department of Revenue in ascertaining the tax liability of a taxpayer
Title
Changes the laws regarding the burden of proof for the Director of the Department of Revenue in ascertaining the tax liability of a taxpayer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 10, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 130 NOES: 13 |
2014-03-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-03-10 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2014-03-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent (H) |
2014-02-27 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-21 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |