MO HB1497 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Requires special elections to fill vacancies in the offices of Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Secretary of State, State Auditor, State Treasurer, and United States Senator
Title
Requires special elections to fill vacancies in the offices of Lieutenant Governor, Attorney General, Secretary of State, State Auditor, State Treasurer, and United States Senator
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-15 | Executive Session Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 26, 2010, 3:00P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2 | |
2010-04-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-03-18 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2010-02-15 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-02-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 90 NOES: 62 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-15 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2010-02-10 | Perfected (H) - AYES: 88 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-02-10 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-08 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-02-04 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-02-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-02 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2010-01-26 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-01-11 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2010-01-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-06 | Read First Time (H) | |
2010-01-04 | Prefiled (H) |