MO HB150 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-27 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions
Title
Modifies the duration of unemployment compensation, the method to pay federal advances, and raises the fund trigger causing contribution rate reductions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-12 - House - HB 150 VETOED HOUSE BILLS (Y: 109 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 150 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 150 (SA 2, SA 3, & SA 4) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 87 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - HB 150 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - HB 150 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - HB 150 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 150 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 88 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - House - HB 150 (SA 2, SA 3, & SA 4) HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 87 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - HB 150 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - HB 150 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - HB 150 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 115 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-12 | House | Passed over Veto (G) - AYES: 109 NOES: 53 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-12 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-05 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2015-04-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-04-21 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-04-21 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 88 NOES: 68 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1 as amended, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED AYES: 87 NOES: 69 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-21 | House | Taken Up |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 aa, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 AYES: 21 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 15, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - SA 1 TO SA 1, SA 1 AS AMENDED, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4 ADOPTED |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 17, 2015, 1:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2015-02-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-02-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-02-03 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations(H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-15 | House | Referred: Employment Security(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |