MO HB1530 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law relating to unemployment compensation benefits
Title
Modifies the law relating to unemployment compensation benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Wanda Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 1530 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House: HB 1530 HBs 3rd READING - CONSENT (Y: 134 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-06 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 12, 2016, 12:00 p.m., SCR 1 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 134 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-23 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Rules(H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-20 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Referred: Employment Security(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |