MO HB1541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Veterans(H)
Pending: House Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires employers to permit veterans receiving medical care at a veterans' facility or by order of the Veterans Administration be given leave without pay to receive medical treatment
Title
Requires employers to permit veterans receiving medical care at a veterans' facility or by order of the Veterans Administration be given leave without pay to receive medical treatment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1541&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1541I.PDF |