MO HB1568 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-21 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows physicians to prescribe naloxone to any individual to administer, in good faith, to another individual suffering from an opioid-induced drug overdose
Title
Allows physicians to prescribe naloxone to any individual to administer, in good faith, to another individual suffering from an opioid-induced drug overdose
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Lynch [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1568 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1568 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 21 N: 134 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 147 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House: HB 1568 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 154 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1568 (HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 108 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: HB 1568 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 21 N: 134 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-21 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-21 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Concurs (H) - SA 1 AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SA 1 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 AYES: 29 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - placed on informal calendar with SA 2 and point of order pending |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, February 25, 2016, 8:30am, Senate Lounge |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-02-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 154 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Perfected (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-01-25 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-01-25 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-13 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |