MO HB1596 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Emerging Issues(H)
Pending: House Emerging Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer
Title
Requires that all sales or transfers of firearms be processed through a licensed firearms dealer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred: Emerging Issues(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-02 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1596&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1596I.PDF |