MO HB1640 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding motor vehicles
Title
Changes the laws regarding motor vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-05-01 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 18, 8:00AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-12 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 082 NOES: 068 | |
2012-04-05 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-04-04 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 4, HA 1 TO HA 5, HA 2 TO HA 5, HA 5AS AMENDED ADOPTED | |
2012-04-04 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-07 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-06 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-02-21 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-02-06 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |