MO HB1717 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-26 - Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the withholding tax filing requirements and income tax deductions for certain small businesses
Title
Changes the laws regarding the withholding tax filing requirements and income tax deductions for certain small businesses
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Kelley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: Ways and Means (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 39 | |
2012-04-19 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 116 NOES: 39 | |
2012-04-19 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-19 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-17 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2012-04-16 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-16 | HCS Adopted (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-03-27 | Objection Filed. Removed from Consent Calendar - Rule 45(b) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-03-20 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-08 | HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2012-03-08 | HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred: Ways and Means (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-13 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |