MO HB1718 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-24 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes provisions relating to the removal of certain court records from automated case management systems
Title
Establishes provisions relating to the removal of certain court records from automated case management systems
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-05 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-04 | House | Prefiled (H) |