MO HB1791 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-19 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Governor to convey specified state properties
Title
Authorizes the Governor to convey specified state properties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-06-19 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2014-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-13 | House | House Message (H) |
2014-05-13 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 85 NOES: 62 |
2014-05-13 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 12 |
2014-05-13 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 135 NOES: 9 |
2014-05-13 | House | Taken Up |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - AYES: 29 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED AYES: 30 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-28 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - committee vote reconsidered, SCS voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) - Returned to Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar (S) |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass Consent |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-03-24 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 5 |
2014-03-24 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-03-20 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-03-06 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Corrections(H) |
2014-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |