MO HB1792 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred: Higher Education(H)
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals provisions that prohibit students who are unlawfully present in the United States from receiving postsecondary education public benefits
Title
Repeals provisions that prohibit students who are unlawfully present in the United States from receiving postsecondary education public benefits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | House | Referred: Higher Education(H) |
2018-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2018-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2017-12-27 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB1792&year=2018&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills181/hlrbillspdf/5571H.01I.pdf |