MO HB18 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for capital improvement projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Title
Appropriates money for capital improvement projects involving the maintenance, repair, replacement, and improvement of state buildings and facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 144 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 18 HABs for 3rd Reading (Y: 127 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - House - HB 18 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 140 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - House - HB 18 HABs for 3rd Reading (Y: 127 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-06-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 140 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Appropriations(S) |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 127 NOES: 25 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2015-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2015-04-28 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2015-04-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-04-08 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Budget(H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-03-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |