MO HB1852 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-14 - Referred: Local Government (H)
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires, beginning January 1, 2011, all operating taxicabs to be equipped with a partition that separates the driver from the back-seat passengers
Title
Requires, beginning January 1, 2011, all operating taxicabs to be equipped with a partition that separates the driver from the back-seat passengers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-14 | Referred: Local Government (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1852&year=2010&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills101/biltxt/intro/HB1852I.htm |