MO HB1860 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17,9:45AM PERSHING CONFERENCE RM
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-16 - Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17,9:45AM PERSHING CONFERENCE RM
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agricultural education in private schools, grain dealers, and agricultural crimes
Title
Changes the laws regarding agricultural education in private schools, grain dealers, and agricultural crimes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, MAY 17,9:45AM PERSHING CONFERENCE RM | |
2012-05-14 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2012-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2012-05-03 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS | |
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 2, 8:30AM, SCR 1 | |
2012-04-26 | Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources (S) | |
2012-04-23 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2012-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 108 NOES: 32 | |
2012-04-17 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED | |
2012-04-17 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-22 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-05 | Referred: Agri-Business (H) | |
2012-03-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |