MO HB1871 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-10 - Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding environmental protection
Title
Changes the laws regarding environmental protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight (S) | |
2010-05-10 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2010-04-27 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 27, 2010, 1:30P.M.,SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2 | |
2010-04-20 | Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 9 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-13 | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 5 ADOPTED | |
2010-04-13 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-25 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-25 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-25 | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-16 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Motion to Reconsider Adopted (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-17 | Referred: Energy and Environment (H) | |
2010-02-01 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |