MO HB1883 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Corrections(H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Corrections(H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Corrections to perform specified actions to improve the ability of working inmates to obtain employment upon release from incarceration
Title
Requires the Department of Corrections to perform specified actions to improve the ability of working inmates to obtain employment upon release from incarceration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred: Corrections(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-17 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1883&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB1883I.PDF |