MO HB1912 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding erection of public buildings so that county commissions no longer need to appoint superintendents for that purpose
Title
Changes the law regarding erection of public buildings so that county commissions no longer need to appoint superintendents for that purpose
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Hinson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 1912 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 104 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 1912 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - House - House: HB 1912 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar - SA 1, SA 2 ADOPTED |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-05-04 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - scs voted do pass |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 20, 2016, 12:30pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-29 | House | Emergency Clause Defeated (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 57 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-29 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 104 NOES: 51 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-29 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-15 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 1 HA 3, HA 3, A.A., HA 5 |
2016-03-15 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2016-03-15 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-14 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2016-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments(H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-09 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2016-02-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-01-26 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-20 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2015-12-21 | House | Prefiled (H) |