MO HB1936 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
Pending: House Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
Pending: House Fiscal Review Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes tax credits to revitalize facilities of historic significance
Title
Establishes tax credits to revitalize facilities of historic significance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 97 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Re-Perfected (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | HCS#2 Adopted (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-05-01 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-25 | House | HCS#2 Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | HCS#2 Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-23 | House | Re-committed to Committee: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-22 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-16 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-16 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred: Rules - Regulatory Oversight(H) |
2024-04-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 15 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-13 | House | Prefiled (H) |