MO HB1963 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-05-27 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to Transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1963 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 112 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2020-05-15 - House - House: HB 1963 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 121 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House: HB 1963 HBs 3rd READ (Y: 121 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-27HouseDelivered to Governor
2020-05-27HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-05-27HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-05-27HouseHouse Message (H)
2020-05-15HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 121 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-15HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SS#3 as amended AYES: 112 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-15HouseTaken Up
2020-05-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-05-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-05-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2020-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SS#3 as amended
2020-05-15SenateThird Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 AYES: 25 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2020-05-15SenateSS Adopted (S) - SS#3
2020-05-15SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S) - SS#3 offered
2020-05-15SenateSS Withdrawn (S) - SS#2 withdrawn
2020-05-15SenateTaken Up
2020-05-14SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1 adopted/SA 2/SS#2 as amended pending
2020-05-14SenateSS #2 Offered
2020-05-14SenateSS Withdrawn (S)
2020-05-14SenateTaken Up
2020-05-06SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar - SA 1 to SA 1, SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4, SA 5, SA 6 adopted/SS, SA 7, SA 1 to SA 7 pending
2020-05-06SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2020-05-06SenateTaken Up
2020-05-06SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-05-06SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-05-04SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2020-04-30SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-04-30SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 12:00 pm, Thursday, April 30, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-02-20SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2020-02-10HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-02-10HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 121 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-10HouseTaken Up
2020-02-04HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted
2020-02-04HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-02-04HouseTaken Up
2020-01-22HousePlaced on Informal Calendar
2020-01-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-14HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2020-01-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2020-01-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-01-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-13HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-09HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-01-07HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback