MO HB1976 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Creates provisions relating to prior authorization of health care services
Title
Creates provisions relating to prior authorization of health care services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House: HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 146 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 146 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-15 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-15 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-11 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Perfected (H) |
2024-04-10 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2024-04-10 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-03-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2024-01-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-01-16 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Referred: Healthcare Reform(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2023-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |