MO HB1992 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-02 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a person commits the offense of refusing to submit to a chemical test when he or she refuses a law enforcement officer's request for a chemical test for blood alcohol content
Title
Specifies that a person commits the offense of refusing to submit to a chemical test when he or she refuses a law enforcement officer's request for a chemical test for blood alcohol content
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB1992&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB1992I.htm |