MO HB1999 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-12 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to retirement systems

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to retirement systems

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-12HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-02-12HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2020-02-11HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-01-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-01-16HouseReferred: Pensions(H)
2020-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-01-08HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback