MO HB2038 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 28 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-03 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Jonathan's Law which changes the requirements for the certification and transfer of a juvenile case to a court of general jurisdiction
Title
Establishes Jonathan's Law which changes the requirements for the certification and transfer of a juvenile case to a court of general jurisdiction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-03 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-05-03 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-30 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-30 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-25 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-25 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Children and Families (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-28 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2038&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2038I.htm |