MO HB2064 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Standing Committee on Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
Pending: House Special Standing Committee on Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires collection agencies to obtain a signed contract from the client prior to beginning collection services and to provide the client a copy of the contract
Title
Requires collection agencies to obtain a signed contract from the client prior to beginning collection services and to provide the client a copy of the contract
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) | |
2012-04-26 | Referred: Special Stand Com on Governmental Affairs (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2064&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2064I.htm |