MO HB2079 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-13 - Referred: Ways and Means(H)
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that no tax change be implemented before the Study Commission on State Tax Policy issues its final report or December 31, 2017, whichever occurs first
Title
Requires that no tax change be implemented before the Study Commission on State Tax Policy issues its final report or December 31, 2017, whichever occurs first
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2079&year=2016&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills161/billpdf/intro/HB2079I.PDF |