MO HB2103 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H) - ACTION POSTPONED
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-25 - Public Hearing Completed (H) - ACTION POSTPONED
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding smoking in public places
Title
Changes the laws regarding smoking in public places
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | Public Hearing Completed (H) - ACTION POSTPONED | |
2012-04-11 | Referred: Small Business (H) | |
2012-04-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2012-03-30 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB2103&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HB2103I.htm |