MO HB2125 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes financial institutions to offer savings promotion plans
Title
Authorizes financial institutions to offer savings promotion plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2125 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 149 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2125 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: HB 2125 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: HB 2125 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 145 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Adopt Substitute (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - House - House: HB 2125 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 155 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2016-06-13 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2016-05-25 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2016-05-25 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2016-05-10 | House | House Message (H) |
2016-05-10 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | House Adopts (H) - SCS AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-05-10 | House | Taken Up |
2016-04-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-04-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-26 | Senate | SEE COMMENTS - Motion for Third reading and final passage withdrawn |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider (H) - Senate Third Reading Vote adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider (H) - Vote by which the title was agreed to adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider (H) - Voted by which the bill was laid on table adopted AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Taken Up |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2016-04-14 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 4, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2016-03-03 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 155 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-03 | House | Taken Up |
2016-03-01 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2016-03-01 | House | Objection Filed on Point of Order (H) - Chair ruled Point of Order well taken AYES: 108 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-03-01 | House | Point of Order (H) - HA 2 |
2016-03-01 | House | Taken Up |
2016-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2016-02-08 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2016-02-01 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred: Banking(H) |
2016-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2016-01-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |