MO HB2220 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-26 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revises the oath that election judges take prior to being commissioned or beginning duties by requiring them to swear to support and defend the Constitution of the United States and of Missouri
Title
Revises the oath that election judges take prior to being commissioned or beginning duties by requiring them to swear to support and defend the Constitution of the United States and of Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Dugger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS | |
2010-04-22 | Executive Session Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 26, 2010, 3:00P.M.SENATE COMMITTEE ROOM 2 | |
2010-04-19 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-15 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 19, 2010, 1:00P.M.SENATE LOUNGE | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-02-24 | Referred: Elections (H) | |
2010-02-23 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-02-22 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |