MO HB2257 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and modifies provisions relating to gold and silver
Title
Creates and modifies provisions relating to gold and silver
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-02 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Action Postponed (H) |
2024-03-26 | House | Executive Session Continued |
2024-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-02-22 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2024-01-04 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-03 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |