MO HB2317 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each member of the General Assembly to be provided with a key which accesses the State Capitol dome and authorizes the Governor to convey certain state property
Title
Requires each member of the General Assembly to be provided with a key which accesses the State Capitol dome and authorizes the Governor to convey certain state property
Sponsors
Rep. Clint Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2010-07-14 | Vetoed by Governor (G) | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2010-05-13 | Emergency Clause Defeated on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 59 NOES: 88 | |
2010-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 91 NOES: 54 | |
2010-05-13 | House Concurs (H) - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 86 NOES: 61 | |
2010-04-28 | Reported to the House with... (S) - SS AS AMENDED | |
2010-04-28 | Emergency Clause Adopted (S) - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 1 | |
2010-04-28 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0 | |
2010-04-28 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2010-04-28 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2010-04-22 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Returned to Committee of Origin (S) | |
2010-04-19 | Removed from Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-15 | SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2010-04-14 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2010-04-08 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2010-04-06 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2010-04-01 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 145 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-04-01 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 144 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0 | |
2010-03-31 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-23 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - No Action Taken (H) | |
2010-03-22 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2010-03-18 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2010-03-17 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions (H) | |
2010-03-16 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |